open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:12-cv-01230
    Party Name:JOHNSON v. R R DONNELLY PRINTING CO
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?205364
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =