open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:13-cv-01507
    Party Name:N.A. WATER SYSTEMS, LLC v. ALLSTATES WORLDCARGO, INC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Time]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?212925
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =