open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:13-cr-00202-1
    Party Name:USA v. BENTLEY et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:July 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
    Date Published:April 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [MAG Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:April 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [MAG Order of Detention]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Postpone and/or Reschedule]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum (NOT SENTENCING MEMORANDUM)]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Postpone and/or Reschedule]
    Date Published:October 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certified Copy of Order]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request for Modifying the Conditions of Supervision]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Destruction of Property]
    Date Published:October 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Destruction of Property]
    Date Published:October 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:September 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:September 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:September 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Case]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:July 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Praecipe to Satisfy Judgment]
    Date Published:December 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 2]
    Date Published:December 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief 2 (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:November 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion to Reduce Term of Probation]
    Date Published:November 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Probation/Supervised Release Violation]
    Date Published:October 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:September 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of US Passport]
    Date Published:April 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Warrant or Summons]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
    Date Published:June 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:January 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Order]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Hearing]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerks Notice to USCA]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certificate of Appealability]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document (Use only for documents already on file)]
    Date Published:June 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Order of Probation]
    Date Published:March 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Order]
    Date Published:February 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:January 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:December 29, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Tentative Findings]
    Date Published:December 12, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 12, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:December 04, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:November 25, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:November 21, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:November 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?211196
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =