open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:1:14-cr-00024-1
    Party Name:USA v. DONICO
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Supervised Release Action]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Depart from Guidelines]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?218137
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =