open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:1:08-cr-00044-1
    Party Name:USA v. TIRADO
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence pursuant to Section 404 of FIRST STEP ACT]
    Date Published:July 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:August 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:August 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Transfer]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer]
    Date Published:December 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other) (DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Order of Probation]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Probation/Supervised Release Violation]
    Date Published:August 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Suspend Sentence]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sentencing Document]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Document]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:November 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Permit]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Permit]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Warrant or Summons]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Medical Treatment ]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Hearing]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Sentence]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Sentence]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request for Modifying the Conditions of Supervision]
    Date Published:April 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report of Speedy Trial Delay]
    Date Published:December 17, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:December 16, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?87955
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =