open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:13-cr-00622-1
    Party Name:USA v. JACKSON
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:July 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Action on Cond. of Ptrl Release]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order re CARES/First Step Act Motion]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Release/Reduced Sentence Pursuant to CARES and/or First Step Act]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Judgment]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release/Reduced Sentence pursuant to CARES and/or First Step Act]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Probation Action]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Terminate]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [MAG Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Oral Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [MAG Oral Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [MAG Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - RESTRICTED]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Indictment]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certified Copy of Order]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Judgment of Forfeiture]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter to Unseal]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment Unsealed]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Audio File]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document (Use only for documents already on file)]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Produce]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sever Defendant]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bill of Particulars]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply to Response]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Suppress]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment - 3582c2]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum Opinion]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Defender Association]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:January 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appear Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Required)]
    Date Published:January 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
    Date Published:December 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest - Other District]
    Date Published:December 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Joinder]
    Date Published:November 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Joinder]
    Date Published:November 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice re: Cancellation of Hearing]
    Date Published:November 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report of Speedy Trial Delay]
    Date Published:November 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Fugitive Order]
    Date Published:October 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:October 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
    Date Published:October 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order]
    Date Published:October 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Report]
    Date Published:October 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:October 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Revoke]
    Date Published:September 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:September 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set Scheduling Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:September 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:September 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revoke]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:August 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum (NOT SENTENCING MEMORANDUM)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:June 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supplement]
    Date Published:June 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Cancelling Deadline ]
    Date Published:May 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Probation]
    Date Published:May 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:May 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Order]
    Date Published:May 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:May 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:April 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine Offense - 18:3582]
    Date Published:April 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:April 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
    Date Published:February 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Commitment to Another District]
    Date Published:February 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
    Date Published:February 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Arrest - Rule 40]
    Date Published:February 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Vacate Document]
    Date Published:January 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:December 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:December 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Memorandum]
    Date Published:December 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Interim Payment]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Interim Payment]
    Date Published:November 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:October 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Production of Jencks Material]
    Date Published:October 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials]
    Date Published:October 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Brady Materials]
    Date Published:October 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jencks Material]
    Date Published:October 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery]
    Date Published:October 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
    Date Published:September 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw]
    Date Published:September 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Investigation and Report]
    Date Published:September 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:August 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Case]
    Date Published:August 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal]
    Date Published:June 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal]
    Date Published:June 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Order]
    Date Published:April 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of US Passport]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:March 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:March 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:March 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Out/Probationer]
    Date Published:December 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:December 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request for Early Termination]
    Date Published:December 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other) (DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL)]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:December 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Copy of TPO Form]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Pre-Plea Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:November 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pre-Plea Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Default]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Entered]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Default Judgment]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Default]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Abstract of Order for Presentence Investigation]
    Date Published:September 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:September 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:September 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Warrant]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant ]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:August 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:August 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File]
    Date Published:June 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Probation - Hearing]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:June 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document]
    Date Published:June 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:May 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:May 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Arrest]
    Date Published:May 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:May 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Probation/Supervised Release Violation]
    Date Published:May 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Writ]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255) - Court Users]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Depart from Guidelines]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Travel]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Travel]
    Date Published:April 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reducing Sentence re: 782 Amendment]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sentencing Document]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Document]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - No PDF]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set Response]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Tentative Findings]
    Date Published:January 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Postpone and/or Reschedule]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Postpone and/or Reschedule]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stay]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set Aside Judgment]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Hearing]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request for Modifying the Conditions of Supervision]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Document]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Supervised Release Action]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Order]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Minute Entry - Multicase]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:October 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Call]
    Date Published:October 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:September 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Order]
    Date Published:September 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:September 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:September 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:August 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - PDF]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerks Notice to USCA]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Sentence]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Sentence]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry)]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Discovery]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment - 3582c2]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment of Forfeiture]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate (Terminates Appeal)]
    Date Published:June 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Praecipe to Satisfy Judgment]
    Date Published:May 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Standing Order 14-6 Re Amendment 782 - Appointing FPD (Crack Cocaine Amendment)]
    Date Published:May 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment - 3582c2]
    Date Published:April 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment 3582c2]
    Date Published:April 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:April 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Warrant or Summons]
    Date Published:March 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Document Filed]
    Date Published:March 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment (Use This If Mandate Will Follow)]
    Date Published:March 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment of Forfeiture]
    Date Published:February 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Order of Probation]
    Date Published:February 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure]
    Date Published:February 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:January 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request and Order to Modify Supervision]
    Date Published:December 29, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:December 09, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:December 08, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:December 03, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:December 03, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 02, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:November 24, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Warrant]
    Date Published:November 21, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:November 20, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Seal (Public Entry - Judicial Document)]
    Date Published:November 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:November 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?202632
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =