open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:17-cr-00248-1
    Party Name:USA v. YOUNGER
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Bond]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 2]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief 2 (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Warrant or Summons]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:August 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Expedite]
    Date Published:August 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Expedite]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Order]
    Date Published:July 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:July 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:June 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:June 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:May 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Supervised Release Action]
    Date Published:May 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Pre-Plea Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:May 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Order]
    Date Published:May 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:May 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Terminating Attorney]
    Date Published:May 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:May 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:January 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File]
    Date Published:January 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:January 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ]
    Date Published:January 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ]
    Date Published:January 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:December 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Order]
    Date Published:December 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:November 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Recusal]
    Date Published:November 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Recusal]
    Date Published:November 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
    Date Published:November 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:November 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure]
    Date Published:November 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing]
    Date Published:November 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:November 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:November 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:November 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial]
    Date Published:October 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Return of Property/PreTrial]
    Date Published:October 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:September 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:September 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Case]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:November 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum Opinion]
    Date Published:November 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:April 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255) - Court Users]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Probation/Supervised Release Violation]
    Date Published:June 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pre-Plea Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?215520
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =