open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cv-00606
    Party Name:UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL, A
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sanctions]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Entry of Default]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?216513
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =