open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:11-cr-00089-1
    Party Name:USA v. STEINER
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Probation/Supervised Release Violation]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:December 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:September 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:September 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:September 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Warrant or Summons]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:April 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:April 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request for Modifying the Conditions of Supervision]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:June 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:June 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Destruction of Property]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Destruction of Property]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?196558
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =