open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:3:14-cv-00152
    Party Name:JAMES v. COLVIN
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Response]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?217697
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =