open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:12-cv-01384
    Party Name:CANTALAMESSA v. KARPIAK
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statistical Case Closing]
    Date Published:March 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion & Order]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?205867
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =