open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:06-cr-00537-2
    Party Name:USA v. KING et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:August 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Copy of TPO Form]
    Date Published:June 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:June 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Permit]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reentry/Drug Court Proceedings]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Audio File]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Probation]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Defender Association]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Warrant]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Bond]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:December 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:[1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:December 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Pretrial Detention]
    Date Published:December 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Writ Issued]
    Date Published:September 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
    Date Published:August 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Entry of Default]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:August 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Commitment to Another District]
    Date Published:August 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply to Response]
    Date Published:June 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:July 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal]
    Date Published:July 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal]
    Date Published:July 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Praecipe to Satisfy Judgment]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:April 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment]
    Date Published:December 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Order]
    Date Published:November 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to Appeal]
    Date Published:November 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other) (DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL)]
    Date Published:October 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:October 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order Dismissing Magistrate Case]
    Date Published:October 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request and Order to Modify Supervision]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Arrest]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order for Writ]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:July 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re: 782 Amendment]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Out/Probationer]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment - 3582c2]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - No PDF]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Minute Entry - Multicase]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Case]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request for Modifying the Conditions of Supervision]
    Date Published:September 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:September 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment 3582c2]
    Date Published:September 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum (NOT SENTENCING MEMORANDUM)]
    Date Published:September 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit(s)]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerks Notice to USCA]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition]
    Date Published:May 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:May 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:March 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Psychiatric Report]
    Date Published:January 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Call]
    Date Published:January 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:January 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:January 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:December 08, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Order of Probation]
    Date Published:December 05, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Hearing]
    Date Published:November 21, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Postpone and/or Reschedule]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?209960
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =