open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:13-cv-00547
    Party Name:CORDES et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion in Limine]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Trial Management Order]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?209535
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =