open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:12-cr-00121-1
    Party Name:USA v. DAVIS
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Release/Reduced Sentence Pursuant to CARES and/or First Step Act]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:July 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:July 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release/Reduced Sentence pursuant to CARES and/or First Step Act]
    Date Published:July 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Bond]
    Date Published:June 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [MAG Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Judgment]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Witness List]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Retain]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Produce]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Discovery]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [New Trial ]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Retain]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Produce]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Interim Payment]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Interim Payment]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Probation]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certified Copy of Order]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Commitment to Another District]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment of Forfeiture]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Judgment of Forfeiture]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Document (NOT Motion or Complaint)]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clarification]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 2]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Copy of TPO Form]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief 2 (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Cancelling Deadline ]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Order]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation to Jury]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Speedy Trial Delay]
    Date Published:February 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest - Other District]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Memorandum]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment of Forfeiture]
    Date Published:November 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Support]
    Date Published:October 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Permit]
    Date Published:October 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum Opinion]
    Date Published:October 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Exclude]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Joinder]
    Date Published:September 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Joinder]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Revoke]
    Date Published:September 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pre-Plea Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:September 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Suppress]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Permit]
    Date Published:August 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Indictment]
    Date Published:August 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Bail]
    Date Published:July 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Order]
    Date Published:July 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:July 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Order]
    Date Published:July 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revoke]
    Date Published:June 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail]
    Date Published:June 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supplement]
    Date Published:June 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acquittal ]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment NOV ]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment (Sealed)]
    Date Published:May 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:May 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
    Date Published:May 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:May 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate]
    Date Published:May 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)]
    Date Published:April 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
    Date Published:April 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Document]
    Date Published:April 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Instructions ]
    Date Published:April 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:April 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Suspend Sentence]
    Date Published:April 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Verdict]
    Date Published:April 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Lunch]
    Date Published:March 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exclude]
    Date Published:March 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial]
    Date Published:February 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Presence of Court Reporter]
    Date Published:February 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Voir Dire]
    Date Published:February 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:February 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:February 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Take Deposition]
    Date Published:February 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to admit]
    Date Published:February 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Forfeiture Hearing]
    Date Published:January 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Sentence]
    Date Published:November 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Sentence]
    Date Published:November 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify]
    Date Published:October 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify]
    Date Published:October 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Recusal]
    Date Published:October 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document (Use only for documents already on file)]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Warrant]
    Date Published:September 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document]
    Date Published:September 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:August 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Take Deposition]
    Date Published:August 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:July 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Mandamus]
    Date Published:July 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ Mandamus]
    Date Published:July 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:July 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing]
    Date Published:July 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Report]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:July 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:July 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Strike]
    Date Published:July 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Out/Probationer]
    Date Published:June 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure]
    Date Published:June 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant ]
    Date Published:March 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Writ Issued]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:January 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:December 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:December 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment]
    Date Published:December 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Entry of Default]
    Date Published:December 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:December 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:December 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Show Cause ]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request for Modifying the Conditions of Supervision]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Admit]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum (NOT SENTENCING MEMORANDUM)]
    Date Published:November 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:November 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:October 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Unseal Case]
    Date Published:October 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:October 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:October 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:October 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Information]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:October 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Compel]
    Date Published:October 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:October 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply to Response]
    Date Published:September 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:September 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Detention]
    Date Published:August 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:August 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
    Date Published:August 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:July 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stay]
    Date Published:July 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - RESTRICTED]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:July 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set Response]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sentencing Document]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document]
    Date Published:June 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:June 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Seal Document]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:June 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:June 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery]
    Date Published:May 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:May 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Probation Action]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Applicable Party Document - to be used ONLY in conjunction with other selection]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Supervised Release Action]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:March 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Arrest]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Tentative Findings]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Expert]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:February 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Expert]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial Brief]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Voir Dire]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Verdict Sheet]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Probation/Supervised Release Violation]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report of Speedy Trial Delay]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other) (DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL)]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of US Passport]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Certify]
    Date Published:January 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certify]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Lis Pendens]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion in Limine]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment Unsealed]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter to Unseal]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Travel]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Travel]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Limine]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Order of Probation]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Plea Document]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Abstract of Order for Presentence Investigation]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Seal (Public Entry - Judicial Document)]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Document]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Terminate]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Praecipe to Satisfy Judgment]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re: 782 Amendment]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Minute Entry - Multicase]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice re: 782 Amendment]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce re: 782 Amendment]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:September 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set Scheduling Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Postpone and/or Reschedule]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Warrant or Summons]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:July 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Hearing]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Defender Association]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request and Order to Modify Supervision]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:June 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
    Date Published:May 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Supervised Release]
    Date Published:April 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention]
    Date Published:April 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:March 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:March 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:February 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:February 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Writ]
    Date Published:February 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - No PDF]
    Date Published:February 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:January 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Entry of Default and Default Judgment]
    Date Published:January 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Postpone and/or Reschedule]
    Date Published:January 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:January 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:December 23, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment 3582c2]
    Date Published:December 22, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Order]
    Date Published:December 12, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Warrant]
    Date Published:December 10, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Call]
    Date Published:December 03, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:December 03, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?93403
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =