open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cr-00176-1
    Party Name:USA v. MCGILVERY
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:January 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment of Forfeiture]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Judgment of Forfeiture]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?217623
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =