open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:12-cr-00123-1
    Party Name:USA v. SEMPF
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
    Date Published:September 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:September 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:September 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Travel]
    Date Published:June 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Travel]
    Date Published:June 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:June 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?203184
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =