open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:11-cr-00125-1
    Party Name:USA v. BRUMBERG
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Probation/Supervised Release Violation]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Supervised Release Action]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?197539
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =