open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:12-cr-00299-2
    Party Name:USA v. GHELARDUCCI et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request for Early Termination]
    Date Published:June 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Probation Action]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:February 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:December 31, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?207037
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =