open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cv-00111
    Party Name:DRONE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. v. PARROT S.A. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Mediation]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Case Referred to Mediation]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:December 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:December 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:November 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reopening Case]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:October 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Response]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for New Trial]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:July 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment as a Matter of Law]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Trial]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion & Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?214451
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =