open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:14-16342-amc
    Party Name:Artafia B Robertson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SEITZ, GARY F. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SEITZ, GARY F. [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SEITZ, GARY F. [Disposition of Adversary]
    Date Published:June 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SEITZ, GARY F [Complaint]
    Date Published:October 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SEITZ, GARY F [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SEITZ, GARY F [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SEITZ, GARY F [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:September 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SEITZ, GARY F [Reopen Case ]
    Date Published:September 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SEITZ, GARY F [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:September 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SEITZ, GARY F [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?444664
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =