open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:14-14192-sr
    Party Name:Robert E. Kershner, Jr. and Stacy L. Kershner
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:January 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Stipulation]
    Date Published:April 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Set]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:March 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Certification of Default]
    Date Published:March 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Modify Plan]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Response]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?442403
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =