open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:13-19826-amc
    Party Name:Melissa Revens
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Praecipe]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Certificate of No Response]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Certification of Default]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing- Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
    Date Published:October 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Compensation]
    Date Published:October 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Withdrawal & Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?436491
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =