open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:14-15021-jkf
    Party Name:Sunday M. Coulter
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Close Case]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Close Case]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:September 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Automatic Order Discharging Debtor (Chapter13)]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [BNC Certificate of Mailing -Notice of Objection to Discharge]
    Date Published:August 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Notice of Objection to Discharge / Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report Closed Completed]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:July 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Domestic Support Obligation Certification]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (No Proof of Claim Filed)]
    Date Published:June 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:July 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?443283
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =