open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:14-19011-mdc
    Party Name:Diane Getley
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Close Case]
    Date Published:June 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Close Case]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:June 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Automatic Order Discharging Debtor (Chapter13)]
    Date Published:June 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:June 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Domestic Support Obligation Certification]
    Date Published:June 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing -Notice of Objection to Discharge]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Notice of Objection to Discharge / Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report Closed Completed]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:October 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Stipulation]
    Date Published:October 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Stipulation of Settlement]
    Date Published:October 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:July 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Response]
    Date Published:July 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:July 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:July 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Notice (Praecipe) of Change of Address]
    Date Published:May 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:April 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:February 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:February 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:June 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Certificate of No Response]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Set]
    Date Published:January 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:January 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Reconsider Dismissal of Case]
    Date Published:December 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:December 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Praecipe to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:November 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:August 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:June 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:June 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:June 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Hearing Held (Other)]
    Date Published:September 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan(pre-confirmation)]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Document]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Add Trustee]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?447631
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =