open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:20-10303-amc
    Party Name:Kerry R Scott
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Hearing Continued (Other)]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Transfer case from Chief Judge Coleman to Judge Ashely M. Chan]
    Date Published:June 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Transfer case from Judge Chan to Chief Judge Magdeline D. Coleman]
    Date Published:June 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [13 Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:April 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Telephonic 341 Meeting Information]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (multi)]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Document]
    Date Published:April 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:February 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
    Date Published:February 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
    Date Published:February 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical - (for initial filing and amendments)]
    Date Published:February 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:February 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Schedules AB - J]
    Date Published:February 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
    Date Published:February 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
    Date Published:February 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Extend / Shorten Time]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:January 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Requiring Documents]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Add Trustee]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number (Form 121)]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Matrix]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:October 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Close Case]
    Date Published:October 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [UST Cert. of Chap. 7 Trustee's Final Account (TDR)]
    Date Published:September 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Final Audit Held]
    Date Published:June 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Approving Final Report & Account]
    Date Published:June 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Distribution]
    Date Published:June 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Final Audit]
    Date Published:April 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Report / Application for Compensation (TFR)]
    Date Published:April 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Certificate of No Response]
    Date Published:March 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Certificate of Costs]
    Date Published:February 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:February 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Compensation]
    Date Published:February 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FELDMAN, LYNN E. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?441121
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =