open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:15-18450-amc
    Party Name:Ocholi Ochala Iredia
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Appeal Returned]
    Date Published:May 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [District Court re: Appeal]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Transmission of Record on Appeal]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Appellee Designation]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Appellant Designation]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Transmission]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Court's Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Barring Debtor]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Opinion (without order)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:August 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:August 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Notice of Change from Asset to No Asset]
    Date Published:June 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Declaration]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Amended List of Creditors (Fee)]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Schedule J - (for first filing and amendments)]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Schedule H - (for first filing and amendments)]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Schedule G - (for first filing and amendments)]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Schedule E/F- (for first filing and amendments)]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Schedule D - (for first filing and amendments)]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Schedule A/B - (for first filing and amendments)]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical - (for initial filing and amendments)]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Reconsider]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Contempt]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Set]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Transcript ]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (Asset)]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Compel]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Extend / Shorten Time]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Certificate of No Response]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Status Hearing]
    Date Published:December 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Status Hearing]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Pro Se Statement]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Statement of Social Security Number (Form B121)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Application to Have the Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:November 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Notice of Change from No Asset to Asset]
    Date Published:November 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Requiring Documents]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Requiring Documents]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Matrix]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Tax Documents]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Application to Proceed in forma pauperis]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Tax Documents]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Application to Proceed in forma pauperis]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (22A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (22A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (22A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (22A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case for Other]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Generic Motion ]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Employ]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Objection]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Schedule C - (for first filing and amendments)]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Schedule A - (for first filing and amendments)]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Schedules Summary - (for initial filing and amendments)]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Schedule I - (for first filing and amendments)]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Document]
    Date Published:November 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [U.S. Trustee Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Dismiss Case for Other]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (multi)]
    Date Published:September 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Reopen Case]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Reinstate Case]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Notice (Praecipe) of Change of Address]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SHUBERT, CHRISTINE C. [Matrix]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?446919
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =