open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-18650-jkf
    Party Name:Glenda A Womack
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Dismiss Case for Other]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Change Trustee]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Confirming Chap. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Hearing Held (Other)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Hearing Continued (Other)]
    Date Published:July 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:July 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Transfer case from Trustee Frederick L. Reigle to Trustee William C. Miller]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Declaration]
    Date Published:July 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Schedule J - (for first filing and amendments)]
    Date Published:July 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Schedule I - (for first filing and amendments)]
    Date Published:July 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan(pre-confirmation)]
    Date Published:July 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Dismiss Case for Other]
    Date Published:June 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Hearing Continued (Other)]
    Date Published:May 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:March 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:March 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
    Date Published:March 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:March 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:February 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:February 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:January 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Amended List of Creditors (Fee)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Schedules AB - J]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Requiring Documents]
    Date Published:January 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Add Trustee]
    Date Published:January 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:December 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:December 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:December 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Matrix]
    Date Published:December 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number (Form 121)]
    Date Published:December 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:December 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice (Praecipe) of Change of Address]
    Date Published:November 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Certification of Default]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Withdrawal & Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:December 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:August 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Stipulation]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Document]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Certificate of No Response]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Modified Plan (post-confirmation)]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Modify Plan]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Response]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?443449
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =