open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:13-19905-amc
    Party Name:Thomas H Rogers
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Close Case]
    Date Published:May 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Close Case]
    Date Published:May 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:May 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Automatic Order Discharging Debtor (Chapter13)]
    Date Published:May 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing -Notice of Objection to Discharge]
    Date Published:April 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Notice of Objection to Discharge]
    Date Published:April 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report Closed Completed]
    Date Published:April 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Withdrawal & Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Reply]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Certificate of No Response]
    Date Published:December 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:December 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Praecipe to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:December 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Compensation]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Modify Plan]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Modified Plan (post-confirmation)]
    Date Published:November 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Domestic Support Obligation Certification]
    Date Published:November 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:October 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Response]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Transfer case from Judge Jean K. FitzSimon to Judge Ashely M. Chan]
    Date Published:September 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Request for Production of Documents]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Request for Admissions]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER,, Esq. WILLIAM C. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing- Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:July 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER, WILLIAM C. [Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?436572
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =