open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:11-22278-ref
    Party Name:Dennis Patrick Guth and Theresa Marie Guth
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:November 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Close Case]
    Date Published:November 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:November 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Automatic Order Discharging Debtor (Chapter13)]
    Date Published:November 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Withdrawal & Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing -Notice of Objection to Discharge]
    Date Published:October 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:October 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Domestic Support Obligation Certification]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Objection to Discharge]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report Closed Completed]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Modified Plan (post-confirmation)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?408967
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =