open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:13-15867-ref
    Party Name:Deborah L. Ebelhauser
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:October 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:October 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Close Case]
    Date Published:October 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Automatic Order Discharging Debtor (Chapter13)]
    Date Published:October 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [BNC Certificate of Mailing- Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:October 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:October 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:October 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:September 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:September 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [BNC Certificate of Mailing -Notice of Objection to Discharge]
    Date Published:September 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Notice of Objection to Discharge]
    Date Published:September 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report Closed Completed]
    Date Published:September 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Domestic Support Obligation Certification]
    Date Published:August 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MILLER*R, WILLIAM [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:August 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Withdrawal & Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?432326
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =