open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:16-bk-01302-
    Party Name:Fernando Marin and Kathy Marin
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Redacted Document]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Order on Application Requesting Redaction of Personal Information]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Order Reassigning Case to RNO]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Redaction of Personal Information (NOT to be used for Transcripts)]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Redacted Document]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Order on Application Requesting Redaction of Personal Information]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Order Reassigning Case to RNO]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Redaction of Personal Information (NOT to be used for Transcripts)]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Final Decree)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Discharge (Chapter 7))]
    Date Published:March 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Automatic Closing - Final Decree]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - no funds collected]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Reassigning Case in the Interests of Judicial Economy]
    Date Published:February 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Certificate of Financial Management OR Certification About a Financial Management Course (Form 423)]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Ch 7)]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Final Report of Ch. 13 Trustee (batch)]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Withdrawal]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice regarding 122A Forms)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [122A Forms]
    Date Published:December 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [BNC Certificate of Notice (341 Meeting Notice (Chapter 7))]
    Date Published:November 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:November 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Meeting of Creditors (Ch. 7 and 13)]
    Date Published:November 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Add Trustee by US Trustee]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: **, No Trustee Appointed Yet ** [Add Trustee by US Trustee]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Order on Motion to Convert Case]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: **, No Trustee Appointed Yet ** [Order on Motion to Convert Case]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: **, No Trustee Appointed Yet ** [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Convert Case]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: **, No Trustee Appointed Yet ** [Convert Case]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Convert Case]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Motion to Dismiss Ch. 13 Case by Trustee (11 USC 521 and 1307(c)) (material default OR tax returns)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Request to Continue Hearing/Trial with Concurrence (LBF 9013-3)]
    Date Published:October 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Answer]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:September 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Automatic Stay (Relief from)]
    Date Published:September 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certification in Support for LR 3015 (LBF 3015-3(a) LBF 3015-3(b) LBF 3015-3(c) OF 2830 LBF 3015-6)]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certificate of Service (or Certificate of Mailing)]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Proceeding Memo (confirmation hearing canceled/continued/rescheduled) (NO Record made)]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Amended Chapter 13 Plan (Pre-Confirmation)]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Proceeding Memo (vCal)]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Confirmation Hearing Continued until After Claims Bar Date]
    Date Published:June 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Notice of Telephonic Court Appearance]
    Date Published:June 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Request for Payment of Ch. 13 Compensation and Expenses (LBF 2016-2(c))]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Order on Motion to Extend, Impose or Reimpose Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Proceeding Memo (multipurpose event)]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice setting Confirmation Hearing)]
    Date Published:May 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Chapter 12/13 Plan)]
    Date Published:May 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Request to BNC - Notice (Confirmation Hearing and Plan) (batch)]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Change of Address]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Meeting of Creditors Held (Ch. 13) and Confirmation Hearing Set]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Final Report of Ch. 13 Trustee (batch)]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Request for Notices under 2002]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Affidavit]
    Date Published:April 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice regarding Motion to Extend Automatic Stay)]
    Date Published:April 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:April 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Generic Order (Use this ONLY if a SPECIFIC order event does NOT exist)]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Semi-passive (Automatic Stay (Motion to Extend OR Impose))]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Automatic Stay (Extend, Impose or Reimpose)]
    Date Published:April 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certification of Execution of Rights and Responsibilities Agreement (LBF 2016-2(a))]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Plan (Ch. 13) (NOT to be used for Amended Plans)]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Employee Income Records (Certification of No Payment Advices)]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Chapter 13 - Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Verification]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Statement of Services Rendered pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 2016-1]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107) or (Form 207) (do NOT use this for Amendments)]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Schedules A-J and/or Summary of Assets and Liabilities (do NOT use this for Amendments)]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal)]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (341 Meeting Notice (Chapter 13))]
    Date Published:April 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Deficient Filing (Missing Documents))]
    Date Published:April 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing (f/k/a Missing documents) (Forms effective 12/01/15)]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Meeting of Creditors (Ch. 7 and 13)]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Automatic Assignment-Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed)]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case/Party]
    Date Published:March 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Dismiss Case/Party (Ch 13 -- 11 USC 1307)]
    Date Published:March 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?235888
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =