open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:10-bk-06716-
    Party Name:Joseph J Cerimele and Jennifer A Cerimele
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Final Decree)]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Final Decree (Ch. 13 Cases)]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Change of Address]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Discharge (Chapter 13))]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:August 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice regarding Transfer of Claim)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Order regarding filing fee due)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Certification in Support for LR 3015(LBF3015-3(a), LBF3015-3(b), LBF3015-3(c), LBF3015-5, LBF3015-6)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Filing Fee Due]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change Rule 3002.1 (No Proof of Claim Filed)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?204089
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =