open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:13-bk-00479-
    Party Name:William J Solonoski and Michele L Solonoski
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Final Decree)]
    Date Published:July 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Final Decree (Ch. 13 Cases)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Review of Ch. 13 Final Report (all payments made)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Final Report of Ch. 13 Trustee (batch)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Discharge (Chapter 13))]
    Date Published:May 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:May 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certification in Support for LR 3015 (LBF 3015-3(a) LBF 3015-3(b) LBF 3015-3(c) OF 2830 LBF 3015-6)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Plan Payments Completed (Ch. 13 Cases ONLY)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Withdrawal of Claim/Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?225739
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =