open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:1:15-bk-05176-
    Party Name:Robert Ronald Romberger, Jr
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Order Dismissing)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Order on Motion to Dismiss Ch 13 Case by Trustee (11 USC 521 and 1307(c))(mat def,tax,plan pay,uncon]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Terminate Motion to Dismiss (w/ability to Cancel Hearing and Terminate Deadlines) PUBLIC ENTRY]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Motion to Dismiss Ch. 13 Case by Trustee (11 USC 521 and 1307(c))(mat def, tax ret, plan pay, unconf]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:October 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Order on Motion for (or termination of) Wage Attachment]
    Date Published:October 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Wage Attachment Order (or termination of)]
    Date Published:October 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Order on Motion to Modify Plan]
    Date Published:February 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Approving/Denying Stipulation]
    Date Published:January 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Stipulation]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Modify Plan (Post Confirmation)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Proceeding Memo (multipurpose event)]
    Date Published:January 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Request to Remove Matter from Hearing List]
    Date Published:January 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Answer]
    Date Published:December 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Automatic Stay (Relief from)]
    Date Published:December 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Reassigning Case in the Interests of Judicial Economy]
    Date Published:November 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice regarding Transfer of Claim)]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:October 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:October 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Request for Notices under 2002]
    Date Published:August 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:August 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Confirmation of Plan (Approval or Denial)]
    Date Published:August 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Withdrawal]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Proceeding Memo (confirmation hearing called/cancl, Amended Plan filed & served)]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan (Pre-Confirmation)]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Claim having been filed)]
    Date Published:May 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Claim filed by Debtor or Trustee]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Order on Motion for Mortgage Modification]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Objection Date)]
    Date Published:April 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Passive]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Mortgage Modification]
    Date Published:March 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Objection to Ch. 13 Plan by Trustee]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice setting Confirmation Hearing)]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Chapter 12/13 Plan)]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Request to BNC - Notice (Confirmation Hearing and Plan) (batch)]
    Date Published:January 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Certification in Support for LR 3015(LBF3015-3(a), LBF3015-3(b), LBF3015-3(c), LBF3015-5, LBF3015-6)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Meeting of Creditors Held (Ch. 13) and Confirmation Hearing Set]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Order on Motion to Avoid Lien]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Order on Motion to Extend, Impose or Reimpose Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Proceeding Memo (vCal)]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Notice of Telephonic Court Appearance]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Objection]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Request for Notices under 2002]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice (341 Meeting Notice (Chapter 13))]
    Date Published:December 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice regarding Motion to Extend Automatic Stay)]
    Date Published:December 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:December 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Order on Motion for (or termination of) Wage Attachment]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Stop BNC Request]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Semi-passive (Automatic Stay (Motion to Extend OR Impose))]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Meeting of Creditors (Ch. 7 and 13)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Filing Fee Due]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Automatic Assignment-Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Avoid Lien]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Avoid Lien]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Automatic Stay (Extend, Impose or Reimpose)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Automatic Stay (Extend, Impose or Reimpose)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Wage Attachment Order (or termination of)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Wage Attachment Order (or termination of)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Request for Payment of Ch. 13 Compensation and Expenses (LBF 2016-2(c))]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Request for Payment of Ch. 13 Compensation and Expenses (LBF 2016-2(c))]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Certification of Execution of Rights and Responsibilities Agreement (LBF 2016-2(a))]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certification of Execution of Rights and Responsibilities Agreement (LBF 2016-2(a))]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Employee Income Records (Payment Advices, Pay Stubs, Pay Advices)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records (Payment Advices, Pay Stubs, Pay Advices)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Plan (Ch. 13) (NOT to be used for Amended Plans)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Plan (Ch. 13) (NOT to be used for Amended Plans)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Objection to Claim/Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:November 26, 2014
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Dismissing Case/Party]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?228311
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =