open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:16-bk-04301-
    Party Name:David C. Reynolds
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Final Report of Ch. 13 Trustee (batch)]
    Date Published:April 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Order Dismissing)]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Order on Motion to Dismiss Ch. 13 Case by Trustee (11 USC 521 and 1307(c)) (material default OR tax]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Hearing)]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Hearing]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certificate of Service (or Certificate of Mailing)]
    Date Published:March 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Intent to Dismiss for nonappearance at 341 meeting)]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Meeting of Creditors (No Show - Dismiss Party)]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Motion to Dismiss Ch. 13 Case by Trustee (11 USC 521 and 1307(c)) (material default OR tax returns)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Stop BNC Request]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Request to BNC - Notice (Confirmation Hearing and Plan) (batch)]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Meeting of Creditors (No Show - Continue)]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Proceeding Memo (multipurpose event)]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Terminate Motion to Dismiss (w/ability to Cancel Hearing) PUBLIC ENTRY]
    Date Published:November 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certification of Execution of Rights and Responsibilities Agreement (LBF 2016-2(a))]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Employee Income Records (Payment Advices, Pay Stubs, Pay Advices)]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Plan (Ch. 13) (NOT to be used for Amended Plans)]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Chapter 13 - Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Verification]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Statement of Services Rendered pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 2016-1]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107) or (Form 207) (do NOT use this for Amendments)]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Schedules A-J and/or Summary of Assets and Liabilities (do NOT use this for Amendments)]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Answer]
    Date Published:November 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Rescheduled or Reconvened 341 Meeting)]
    Date Published:November 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Meeting of Creditors Rescheduled (failure to file required documents - Ch. 13)]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Motion to Dismiss Ch. 13 Case by Trustee (11 USC 521 and 1307(c))]
    Date Published:November 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Change of Address]
    Date Published:October 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (341 Meeting Notice (Chapter 13))]
    Date Published:October 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Deficient Filing (Missing Documents))]
    Date Published:October 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Meeting of Creditors (Ch. 7 and 13)]
    Date Published:October 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing (f/k/a Missing documents)]
    Date Published:October 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Automatic Assignment-Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Order on Motion to Avoid Lien]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?234738
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =