open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:4:14-ap-00122-
    Party Name:Oleyar (Trustee) v. Young et al
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Oleyar, (Trustee) Michael G [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Oleyar, (Trustee) Michael G [Close/Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (public entry, sends emails, no doc # or PDF)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Oleyar, (Trustee) Michael G [Certificate of Service (or Certificate of Mailing)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Oleyar, (Trustee) Michael G [Approve Compromise or Settlement/Stipulation]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Oleyar, (Trustee) Michael G [Proceeding Memo Order (Judge Thomas Cases ONLY)]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Oleyar, (Trustee) Michael G [Request to Remove Matter from Hearing List]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Oleyar, (Trustee) Michael G [Proceeding Memo (multipurpose event)]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Oleyar, (Trustee) Michael G [Notice of Telephonic Court Appearance]
    Date Published:June 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Oleyar, (Trustee) Michael G [Continue/Reschedule a Hearing or Trial]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?234952
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =