open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:3:20-cv-00074
    Party Name:RODRIGUEZ v. USA
  • Filing Type:Civil [Deficiency Order]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close/Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (public entry, sends emails, no doc # or PDF)]
    Date Published:September 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Show Cause (hearing)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Status Report]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions)]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:May 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:April 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Brief]
    Date Published:April 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Document Filed]
    Date Published:March 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing canceled (PUBLIC ENTRY - do not use with a private event)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?234307
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =