open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:1:11-bk-02777-
    Party Name:Douglas Lynn Stone and Melissa Pauline Stone
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Final Decree)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Final Decree (Ch. 13 Cases)]
    Date Published:November 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Substitution of Attorney (batch)]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Review of Ch. 13 Final Report (all payments made)]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Final Report of Ch. 13 Trustee (batch)]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Discharge (Chapter 13))]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Report from Trustee re: Unclaimed Funds/Small Dividends]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Certification in Support for LR 3015 (LBF 3015-3(a) LBF 3015-3(b) LBF 3015-3(c) OF 2830 LBF 3015-6)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Plan Payments Completed (Ch. 13 Cases ONLY)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Order on Motion for (or termination of) Wage Attachment]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Wage Attachment Order (or termination of)]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Certificate of Financial Management OR Certification About a Financial Management Course (Form 423)]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [ECF Login Disabled]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Mortgage Modification]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?211103
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =