open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:14-bk-00532-
    Party Name:J3 Energy Group, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [BNC Certificate of Notice (Final Decree)]
    Date Published:May 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Final Decree (Ch. 7 indiv and business Cases)]
    Date Published:April 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Notice to Trustee (Final Report received from UST)]
    Date Published:April 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Certification of Completion of Estate Administration by Trustee and Application for Discharge]
    Date Published:April 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Order regarding Allowances in Trustees Final Report & Account and Application for Fees]
    Date Published:February 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Hearing)]
    Date Published:February 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Hearing]
    Date Published:February 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Notice of Final Report and Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Trustees Final Report and Application for Fees]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Certificate of fees and bill for collection]
    Date Published:November 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Request for Court Costs]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Approving/Denying Withdrawal]
    Date Published:September 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Order on Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement/Stipulation]
    Date Published:September 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Withdrawal of Claim/Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:September 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Party to serve notice]
    Date Published:September 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Certificate of Service (or Certificate of Mailing)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Approve Compromise or Settlement/Stipulation]
    Date Published:August 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Status Report]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Order District Court Judge]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Generic Order (Use this ONLY if a SPECIFIC order event does NOT exist)]
    Date Published:March 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Order on Application for allowance of compensation and expenses]
    Date Published:March 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Notice of Transmittal of Record on Appeal to USDC (only for Clerks staff use)]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Generic Order]
    Date Published:February 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Withdraw]
    Date Published:February 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Compensation & Expenses]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Transmittal of Documents (only for Clerks staff use)]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [PDF document]
    Date Published:January 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Motion for Leave to Appeal]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Transcript of Testimony]
    Date Published:January 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Objection]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Order on Objection to Claim or Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:January 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Order on Motion for Examination under Rule 2004]
    Date Published:December 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:December 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Hearing (or Conference, Preliminary Hearing, Status Conference, Pre-Trial Conference, Argument)]
    Date Published:December 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Close/Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (public entry, sends emails, no doc # or PDF)]
    Date Published:December 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Brief]
    Date Published:December 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Protective Order]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Proceeding Memo (multipurpose event)]
    Date Published:December 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Notice of Telephonic Court Appearance]
    Date Published:November 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal)]
    Date Published:November 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Examination under 2004]
    Date Published:November 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Answer]
    Date Published:November 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Exhibit]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Objection to Claim/Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:October 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Complaint]
    Date Published:October 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Order on Application for Payment of Administrative Expenses/Claims (11 USC 503(b))]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Request for Notices under 2002]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Notice and Certificate of Service (NOT for sale motions)]
    Date Published:September 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Payment of Administrative Expenses/Claims (11 USC 503(b))]
    Date Published:September 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Trustees Initial Report]
    Date Published:August 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Certificate of outstanding quarterly fees]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Ch 7)]
    Date Published:July 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice Setting Claims Bar Date)]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Order on Application to Employ]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Notice of Change to Asset Case]
    Date Published:July 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Hearing canceled (PUBLIC ENTRY - do not use with a private event)]
    Date Published:July 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Withdrawal]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Employ (do NOT use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner, Ombudsman, Trustee)]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [BNC Certificate of Notice (341 Meeting Notice (Chapter 7))]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Meeting of Creditors (Ch. 7 and 13)]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Add Trustee by US Trustee]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: **, No Trustee Appointed Yet ** [Add Trustee by US Trustee]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schwab, (Trustee) William G [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case/Party and/or Convert Ch 11 Case to Ch 7 (11 USC 1112(a) or 1112(b))]
    Date Published:June 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: **, No Trustee Appointed Yet ** [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case/Party and/or Convert Ch 11 Case to Ch 7 (11 USC 1112(a) or 1112(b))]
    Date Published:June 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Discrepancy between CM/ECF entry and uploaded PDF]
    Date Published:June 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:June 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Claim/Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:May 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Generic Order (Use this ONLY if a SPECIFIC order event does NOT exist)]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Generic Order]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Continue]
    Date Published:April 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Amended Plan of Reorganization (Ch. 11 Small Business)]
    Date Published:March 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Reconsider, Alter, Amend or Vacate Order]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure Statement (Ch. 11)]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Examination under 2004]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Expedited Consideration]
    Date Published:March 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Order on Application to Employ]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Quash]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Employ (do NOT use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner, Ombudsman, Trustee)]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Plan of Reorganization (Ch. 11 Small Business)]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure Statement (Ch. 11 Small Business)]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Filing fee not required]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Order on Request for Waiver]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Request for Waiver (NOT to be used for an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or to Waive FEES)]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Close/Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (public entry, sends emails, no doc # or PDF)]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Answer]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Notice and Certificate of Service (NOT for sale motions)]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Approve Compromise or Settlement/Stipulation]
    Date Published:October 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Hearing canceled (PUBLIC ENTRY - do not use with a private event)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal)]
    Date Published:September 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Request to Continue Hearing/Trial with Concurrence (LBF 9013-3)]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Approving/Denying Stipulation]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Order sent to counsel for mailing (*ECF Atty*)]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Hearing)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service (or Certificate of Mailing)]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Hearing]
    Date Published:August 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Joinder]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case/Party and/or Convert Ch 11 to Ch 7 (11 USC 1112(a) OR 1112(b))]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Notice not attached to docket entry]
    Date Published:July 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:July 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Hearing (Ex. Hearing, Conference, Preliminary Hearing, Status Conference, Pre-Trial Conference)]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Compensation & Expenses]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo (multipurpose event)]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - Ad Hoc minimal funds collected]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Rescheduled BEFORE 341 meeting called to order]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Continue/Reschedule a Hearing or Trial]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Telephonic Court Appearance]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Hearing (or Conference, Preliminary Hearing, Status Conference, Pre-Trial Conference, Argument)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?232751
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =