open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:13-bk-05095-
    Party Name:Peter H. Rutt and Shanie A. Rutt
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Final Decree)]
    Date Published:March 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Final Decree (Ch. 13 Cases)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Order Reassigning Case JJT]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Review of Ch. 13 Final Report (all payments made)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Final Report of Ch. 13 Trustee (batch)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Discharge (Chapter 13))]
    Date Published:December 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certification in Support for LR 3015 (LBF 3015-3(a) LBF 3015-3(b) LBF 3015-3(c) OF 2830 LBF 3015-6)]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Request for Notices under 2002]
    Date Published:November 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:November 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:November 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Plan Payments Completed (Ch. 13 Cases ONLY)]
    Date Published:November 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:November 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?230593
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =