open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:13-bk-05575-
    Party Name:Valerio A Crespo
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Filing Fee Due]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Reopen Case]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Dismissing Case/Party]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?236858
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =