open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:1:14-bk-03300-
    Party Name:VO Enterprises LLC, a Corporation
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case/Party and/or Convert Ch 11 Case to Ch 7 (11 USC 1112(a) or 1112(b))]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certification of Compliance with Order]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Answer]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Use, Sale, Lease or Prohibit or Condition the use, sale or lease of property]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Proceeding Memo (multipurpose event)]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case/Party and/or Convert Ch 11 to Ch 7 (11 USC 1112(a) OR 1112(b))]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Shorten Time]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order sent to counsel for mailing (*ECF Atty*)]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service (or Certificate of Mailing)]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing (Sale Free and Clear)]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Flags Set or Removed]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Use, Sale, Lease or Prohibit or Condition of Property]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?235664
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =