open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:1:12-bk-06533-
    Party Name:Norris Child Care Consultants, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Order Closing Reopened Case)]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Closing reopened case]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Request to Remove Matter from Hearing List]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Hearing (Ex. Hearing, Conference, Preliminary Hearing, Status Conference, Pre-Trial Conference)]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Proceeding Memo (vCal)]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Answer]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Request for Notices under 2002]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal)]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Notice not filed]
    Date Published:December 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Exhibit]
    Date Published:December 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Status Conference]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Generic Motion]
    Date Published:December 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
    Date Published:December 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Proceeding Memo (multipurpose event)]
    Date Published:December 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Notice of Telephonic Court Appearance]
    Date Published:December 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Hearing]
    Date Published:November 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Reopen Case]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Final Decree)]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Final Decree (Ch. 7 indiv and business Cases)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Certification of Completion of Estate Administration by Trustee and Application for Discharge]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Order regarding Allowances in Trustees Final Report & Account and Application for Fees]
    Date Published:August 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Notice of Final Report and Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Notice to Trustee (Final Report received from UST)]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Trustees Final Report and Application for Fees]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Order on Motion to Use, Sale, Lease or Prohibit or Condition the use, sale or lease of property]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Use, Sale, Lease or Prohibit or Condition of Property]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Request to Continue Hearing/Trial with Concurrence (LBF 9013-3)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?224327
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =