open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:18-bk-01208-
    Party Name:Paul Drozda
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Final Report of Ch. 13 Trustee (batch)]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certificate of Default]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Order on Motion to Modify Plan]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Stipulation Due]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Proceeding Memo (multipurpose event)]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Request to Remove Matter from Hearing List]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Answer]
    Date Published:December 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Automatic Stay (Relief from)]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Modify Plan (Post Confirmation)]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Approving/Denying Stipulation]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Stipulation]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Motion to Dismiss Ch. 13 Case by Trustee (11 USC 521 and 1307(c))(mat def, tax ret, plan pay, unconf]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:November 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Confirmation of Plan (Approval or Denial)]
    Date Published:August 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Proceeding Memo (vCal)]
    Date Published:August 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Proceeding Memo (confirmation hearing called/cancl, Amended Plan filed & served)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Amended Chapter 13 Plan (Pre-Confirmation)]
    Date Published:July 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certification in Support for LR 3015 (LBF 3015-3(a) LBF 3015-3(b) LBF 3015-3(c) OF 2830 LBF 3015-6)]
    Date Published:July 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certification of Execution of Rights and Responsibilities Agreement (LBF 2016-2(a))]
    Date Published:July 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Request for Payment of Ch. 13 Compensation and Expenses (LBF 2016-2(c))]
    Date Published:July 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice setting Confirmation Hearing)]
    Date Published:May 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Chapter 12/13 Plan)]
    Date Published:May 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Request to BNC - Notice (Confirmation Hearing and Plan) (batch)]
    Date Published:May 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Meeting of Creditors Held (Ch. 13) and Confirmation Hearing Set]
    Date Published:May 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change Rule 3002.1 (No Proof of Claim Filed)]
    Date Published:May 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Terminate Motion to Dismiss (w/ability to Cancel Hearing) PUBLIC ENTRY]
    Date Published:May 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Plan (Ch. 13) (NOT to be used for Amended Plans)]
    Date Published:May 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Employee Income Records (Certification of NO Payment Advices or Pay Stubs or Pay Advices)]
    Date Published:May 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Chapter 13 - Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
    Date Published:May 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Chapter 13 - Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
    Date Published:May 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) or Petition Preparer (Form 2800)]
    Date Published:May 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107) or (Form 207) (do NOT use this for Amendments)]
    Date Published:May 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Schedules A-J and/or Summary of Assets and Liabilities (do NOT use this for Amendments)]
    Date Published:May 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Rescheduled or Reconvened 341 Meeting)]
    Date Published:April 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Meeting of Creditors Rescheduled (failure to file required documents - Ch. 13)]
    Date Published:April 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:April 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Vacating Discharge, Final Decree or Order]
    Date Published:April 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Dismissing Case/Party]
    Date Published:April 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Motion to Dismiss Ch. 13 Case by Trustee (11 USC 521 and 1307(c))]
    Date Published:April 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
    Date Published:April 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certificate of Service (or Certificate of Mailing)]
    Date Published:April 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certificate of Service was not filed]
    Date Published:April 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Extend Time]
    Date Published:April 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (341 Meeting Notice (Chapter 13))]
    Date Published:March 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Meeting of Creditors (Ch. 7 and 13)]
    Date Published:March 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing (f/k/a Missing documents)]
    Date Published:March 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Automatic Assignment-Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:March 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:March 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:March 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed)]
    Date Published:March 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:March 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed)]
    Date Published:March 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:March 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:March 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Form 121) (Do NOT select this event with other events)]
    Date Published:March 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:March 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Form 121) (Do NOT select this event with other events)]
    Date Published:March 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Final Report of Ch. 13 Trustee (batch)]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Change of Address]
    Date Published:September 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:September 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Certificate of Default]
    Date Published:June 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal)]
    Date Published:October 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Approving/Denying Stipulation]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Proceeding Memo Order (Judge Thomas Cases ONLY)]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Stipulation]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Withdrawal]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?233768
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =