open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:14-24541-
    Party Name:Thomas F. Easton
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:July 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
    Date Published:June 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Status Report]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Costs]
    Date Published:April 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Request for Clerk's Certificate of Costs]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Post Confirmation]
    Date Published:March 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
    Date Published:March 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Brief/Memorandum]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw/Dismiss Document]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw/Dismiss Document -bk-]
    Date Published:December 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
    Date Published:November 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Ballot Summary]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certification of Counsel Regarding - PAWB Form 26]
    Date Published:July 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing on Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:May 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Chapter 11 Plan]
    Date Published:May 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Summary of Chapter 11 Plan]
    Date Published:May 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure Statement - PAWB Form 13]
    Date Published:May 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Mediation Completion Report (Form 32)]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:February 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Mediator per Local Rule 9019-3(k)]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order -Non-motion related-]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing w/o Forms]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Mediation Order]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Rescheduled]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
    Date Published:December 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set B]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compel]
    Date Published:December 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal -for attorney use-]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Fixing Deadline to Deny a Motion]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Document]
    Date Published:September 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
    Date Published:September 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Response]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing on a Judge Bohm Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Financial Report]
    Date Published:July 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Additional Filing Deficiencies]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?328127
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =