open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:14-10486-
    Party Name:Nathan E. Goodman
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Final Decree]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Ch 13 UST Form 13-FR-S -batch-]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Approving Report of Receipts and Disbursements]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing Set E]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion for Approval of Report of Receipts and Disbursements - Plan Completed]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Response to Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certification of Discharge Eligibility - Ch 13]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Claims Filed And Intention to Pay Claims -batch-]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustees Notice of Funds on Reserve]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Amended Schedules A B C G H I J]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Approve Settlement]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustees Interim Notice of Cure of Arrears]
    Date Published:December 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:November 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing on a Judge Agresti Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:November 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Employ]
    Date Published:November 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:October 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [none]
    Date Published:October 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:October 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:November 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Attach Wages]
    Date Published:October 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Attach Wages - PAWB Form 11]
    Date Published:October 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Terminate Wage Attachment]
    Date Published:October 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Order]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Reopen Case]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Status Report]
    Date Published:September 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing w/o Forms]
    Date Published:September 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Generic Motion]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Document]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:September 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Affidavit]
    Date Published:September 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Order -multi-]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Show Cause for Other Action]
    Date Published:September 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC PDF Notice]
    Date Published:September 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Order -Non-motion related-]
    Date Published:September 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:September 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Report -Generic-]
    Date Published:September 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Vacating Order]
    Date Published:August 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:August 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Review of Bankruptcy Petition]
    Date Published:August 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Document Under Seal]
    Date Published:August 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Sealing]
    Date Published:August 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Rule to Show Cause Other Action]
    Date Published:August 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Conference Held]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan and Setting Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?323690
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =