open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:14-24504-
    Party Name:Richard B Stinson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:July 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Receipt of Costs Payment]
    Date Published:July 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Distribution]
    Date Published:June 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Ch 7 UST Form 101-7-NFR: Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Application for Compensation]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Compensation]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Ch 7 UST 101-7-TFR: Ch 7 Trustees Final Report, App Compensation, Statement of Review]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Proof of Transmittal of Order of Dist. and Final Rpt to UST]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Certificate of Costs]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Request for Clerk's Certificate of Costs]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Receipt of Funds for Registry Account]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Report -Generic-]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Order]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Status Report]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Generic Motion]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Order -Non-motion related-]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Withdrawal -for attorney use-]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Report of Sale]
    Date Published:May 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Requiring Certification Under 5005(b)(2)]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
    Date Published:April 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Sell Property]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Exhibit]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Proof of Publication of Notice of Sale]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Request to Postpone Payment of Fees]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f)]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Response]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Hearing on a Judge Bohm Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zebley, Charles O. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?328061
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =