open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:14-70890-
    Party Name:Robert E Leasock, Jr. and Rebecca L Leasock
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:April 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Final Decree]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Approving Report of Receipts and Disbursements]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certification of Discharge Eligibility - Ch 13]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing Set on Trustee Application]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion for Approval of Report of Receipts and Disbursements - Plan Completed]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Response to Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Claims Filed And Intention to Pay Claims -batch-]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:July 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Conference Held]
    Date Published:June 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan and Setting Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Loss Mitigation Final Report and Portal Account History]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing on Amended Plan]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan - PAWB Form 10]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Order]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Generic Motion]
    Date Published:March 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Update Loss Mitigation Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustees Notice of Funds on Reserve]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Withdrawal -for attorney use-]
    Date Published:September 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Affidavit]
    Date Published:August 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Loss Mitigation Status Report]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Response]
    Date Published:August 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Sanctions]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Compel]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Approving Interim Loan Modification (Local Form 47)]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:May 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Order -Non-motion related-]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:April 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing Set F]
    Date Published:March 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing on a Judge Deller Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Objection to the Notice of Post-Petition Fees, Expenses and Charges]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing w/o Forms]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Declaration Re: Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Conference Continued]
    Date Published:September 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Extending the Period for Loss Mitigation (Local Form 43)]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Extend the Period for Loss Mitigation Local Form 42]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Attach Wages]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Terminate Wage Attachment]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Attach Wages - PAWB Form 11]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:June 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [none]
    Date Published:December 27, 2014
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:December 27, 2014
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Ch 13 UST Form 13-FR-S -batch-]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?321333
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =