open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:12-20576-jkf
    Party Name:Sui Lin Dan-Jones
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:July 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Judge Reassignment]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Redact]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Judge Reassignment]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Redact (Fee Per Case)]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Ch 13 UST Form 13-FR-S -batch-]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?327323
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =