open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:14-23795-
    Party Name:Desonda L. Hughes
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Pay Chapter 13 Installment for Cases Filed On or After 6/1/2014]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Final Decree]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:November 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:August 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Closed for No Asset Cases]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:June 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Individual]
    Date Published:May 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Vacating Order]
    Date Published:May 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:May 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Petition Completed]
    Date Published:May 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Notice Regarding Modification to Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 30]
    Date Published:May 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Response]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:April 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Rule to Show Cause Other Action]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Update Incomplete Filings Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Notice of Review of Bankruptcy Petition]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [none]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shearer, Robert [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Conference Held]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:December 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:September 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan and Setting Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:July 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Response]
    Date Published:July 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 & 12]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Plan - PAWB Form 10]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Petition Completed]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Attach Wages - PAWB Form 11]
    Date Published:May 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Attach Wages]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Extend Time to Complete the Bankruptcy Filing]
    Date Published:May 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustees Report of Receipts and Disbursements]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Rule to Show Cause for Dismissal of Case BK]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Review of Bankruptcy Petition]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Dismissing Case or Debtor]
    Date Published:April 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Order -Non-motion related-]
    Date Published:April 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Withdrawal -for attorney use-]
    Date Published:April 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Withdrawal of Claim]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing on Amended Plan]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Fixing Deadline to Deny a Motion]
    Date Published:February 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing on a Judge Agresti Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing w/o Forms]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Conference Continued]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Disposition of Adversary]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Update Plan, Amended Plan, Disclosure Statement, or Objection to Disclosure Statement Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:August 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice Reminder to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:July 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:June 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:June 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [none]
    Date Published:May 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:May 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:December 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Ch 13 UST Form 13-FR-S -batch-]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?326965
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =